US HB7696 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish effluent limitations guidelines and standards and water quality criteria for perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances under the Federal Water Pollution Control Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Clean Water Standards for PFAS 2.0 Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2022-05-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2022-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3622 (Related) 2021-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB1907 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB4161 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1907 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB4161 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7696/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7696/BILLS-117hr7696ih.pdf |