US HB7589 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to prohibit the imposition or collection of copayments for certain mental health outpatient care visits of veterans, and for other purposes.
Title
Reduce and Eliminate Mental Health Outpatient Veteran Copays Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-09-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8185) |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7589. |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8185-8186) |
2022-09-28 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-09-20 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2022-06-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-04-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-04-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4951 (Related) 2022-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.