US HB7569 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Energy to establish a program to provide financial assistance to graduate students and postdoctoral researchers pursuing certain courses of study relating to cybersecurity and energy infrastructure.
Title
Energy Cybersecurity University Leadership Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] | Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2022-07-27 | House | Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1254, and the motion offered by Mr. Kildee, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 623, as amended; H.R. 3952, as amended; H.R. 3962, as amended; H.R. 4551; H.R. 5313, as amended; H.R. 6933; H.R. 7132, as amended; H.R. 7361; H.R. 7569; H.R. 7624, as amended; H.R. 7733, as amended; and H.R. 7981, as amended. (consideration: CR H7197-7211, H7219-7220, H7223-7237; text: 07/26/2022 CR H7090) |
2022-07-27 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1254, proceedings on H.R. 7569 are considered vacated. |
2022-07-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-07-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7569. |
2022-07-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7090-7091) |
2022-07-26 | House | Mr. Beyer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-07-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 320. |
2022-07-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 117-413. |
2022-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-04-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2022-04-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1254 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.