US HB7327 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides additional funding in FY2020 for taxpayer services, social services block grants, and infrastructure grants to improve child care safety, including needs assessments. The bill adds and modifies certain tax provisions to increase and make refundable the child and dependent care tax credit; increase the exclusion from employee income for employer-provided dependent care assistance; allow employers payroll tax credits for certain fixed expenses of child care facilities closed due to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019), certain employer-paid employee dependent care expenses, and the employment of workers who perform domestic service in the private home of an employer; and allow a carryover of unused benefits or contributions remaining in a dependent care flexible spending arrangement from the 2020 plan year to the 2021 plan year. The bill increases funding (1) in FY2020-FY2024 for the general child care entitlement under the Social Security Act, and (2) for child care services for the children of essential workers. The bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to conduct an immediate needs assessment of the condition of child care facilities throughout the United States and authorizes HHS to award grants to acquire, construct, renovate, or improve child care facilities, including expanding facilities to respond to the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Child Care for Economic Recovery Act
Sponsors
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] |
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-29 - House - On passage (Y: 250 N: 161 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-07-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-07-29 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 250 - 161 (Roll no. 172). (text: CR H3908-3913) |
2020-07-29 | House | UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was on passage of H.R. 7327, which was debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed. |
2020-07-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3966) |
2020-07-29 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 8 of rule XX, further proceedings on H.R. 7327 were postponed. |
2020-07-29 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2020-07-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 7327. |
2020-07-29 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6395, H.R. 7027, H.R. 7327 and H.R. 1957. Provides for the consideration of H.R. 6395, H.R. 7027, H.R. 7327, and the Senate Amendments to H.R. 1957. Rule also provides that H.Res. 967, as amended by H.Res. 1017, is further amended by inserting a new date. |
2020-07-29 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1053. (consideration: CR H3908-3921) |
2020-07-20 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1053 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6395, H.R. 7027, H.R. 7327 and H.R. 1957. Provides for the consideration of H.R. 6395, H.R. 7027, H.R. 7327, and the Senate Amendments to H.R. 1957. Rule also provides that H.Res. 967, as amended by H.Res. 1017, is further amended by inserting a new date. |
2020-06-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1053 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6047 (Related) 2020-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6460 (Related) 2020-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB7837 (Related) 2020-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Revenue Measures.
HB6047 (Related) 2020-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6460 (Related) 2020-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB7837 (Related) 2020-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Revenue Measures.
Subjects
Adult day care
Appropriations
Building construction
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of the Treasury
Disability assistance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment taxes
Executive agency funding and structure
Families
Family services
First responders and emergency personnel
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Income tax credits
Income tax exclusion
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Inflation and prices
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social security and elderly assistance
Solid waste and recycling
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax-exempt organizations
Wages and earnings
Appropriations
Building construction
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of the Treasury
Disability assistance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment taxes
Executive agency funding and structure
Families
Family services
First responders and emergency personnel
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Income tax credits
Income tax exclusion
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Inflation and prices
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social security and elderly assistance
Solid waste and recycling
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax-exempt organizations
Wages and earnings