US HB6460 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides funding for FY2020 for child and adult-dependent care services for essential workers. Essential workers include (1) health-sector employees, (2) emergency responders, (3) sanitation workers, (4) employees of businesses required to remain open during the public health emergency declared on January 31, 2020, and (5) other workers a state deems essential and who are unable to telework. Eligibility for such funding is not based on income.
Title
To provide funding for needed child and adult care so that essential workers can report to work during the COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] |
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support. |
2020-04-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-04-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3567 (Related) 2020-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7327 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7327 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Subjects
Adult day care
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Families
Family services
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Solid waste and recycling
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Families
Family services
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Solid waste and recycling
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6460/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6460/BILLS-116hr6460ih.pdf |