US HB7232 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wildlife Corridors Conservation Act of 2018
Title
Wildlife Corridors Conservation Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2018-12-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2018-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2018-12-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-12-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-12-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-12-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-12-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3715 (Same As) 2018-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Charitable contributions
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Department of the Interior
Ecology
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Military facilities and property
Regional and metropolitan planning
State and local government operations
U.S. territories and protectorates
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Charitable contributions
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Department of the Interior
Ecology
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Military facilities and property
Regional and metropolitan planning
State and local government operations
U.S. territories and protectorates
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/7232/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr7232/BILLS-115hr7232ih.pdf |