US HB723 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-20 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 286.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-20 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 286.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wood-Pawcatuck Watershed Protection Act - Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate for study for potential addition to the national wild and scenic rivers system specified segments of the Beaver, Chipuxet, Queen, Wood, and Pawcatuck Rivers in Rhode Island and Connecticut. Requires the study to: (1) include the effect of designation on existing commercial and recreational activities, energy production and transmission infrastructure, and the authority of state and local governments to manage such activities; and (2) identify authorities allowing the influence of local land use decisions or restrictions on non-federal land, condemnation authorities, and all private property located in the study area.
Title
Wood-Pawcatuck Watershed Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | Senate | Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 286. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2013-06-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-06-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3268) |
2013-06-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 723. |
2013-06-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3268-3269) |
2013-06-11 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 49. |
2013-05-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-73. |
2013-04-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-04-24 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB349 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 114.
Subjects
Connecticut
Government studies and investigations
Lakes and rivers
Public lands and natural resources
Rhode Island
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Government studies and investigations
Lakes and rivers
Public lands and natural resources
Rhode Island
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats