US SB349 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 114.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 114.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wood-Pawcatuck Watershed Protection Act - Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate for study for potential addition to the national wild and scenic rivers system specified segments of the Beaver, Chipuxet, Queen, Wood, and Pawcatuck Rivers in Rhode Island and Connecticut. Requires submission to Congress of a report describing such study's results.
Title
Wood-Pawcatuck Watershed Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 114. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-60. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-27. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S780) |
Same As/Similar To
HB723 (Same As) 2013-12-20 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 286.
Subjects
Connecticut
Government studies and investigations
Public lands and natural resources
Rhode Island
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Government studies and investigations
Public lands and natural resources
Rhode Island
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats