US HB721 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) modify the exemption from the 10% penalty for premature distributions from governmental employee benefit plans to qualified public safety employees to eliminate the restriction that such plans be defined benefit plans; and (2) exempt from tax penalties certain periodic payments made to qualified public safety employees before the enactment of the Pension Protection Act of 2006 (i.e., August 17, 2006).
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify the exception from the 10 percent penalty for early withdrawals from governmental plans for qualified public safety employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Andrews [D-NJ] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Christopher Carney [D-PA] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Kendrick Meek [D-FL] | Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-27 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4239 (Related) 2009-12-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1657 (Same As) 2009-09-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1657 (Same As) 2009-09-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Fires
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Income tax exclusion
Law enforcement officers
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Fires
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Income tax exclusion
Law enforcement officers
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/721/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr721/BILLS-111hr721ih.pdf |