US HB7198 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-10 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 11.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-10 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 11.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 5, United States Code, to require greater transparency for Federal regulatory decisions that impact small businesses, and for other purposes.
Title
Prove It Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Finstad [R-MN] | Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D-CO] | Rep. Nathaniel Moran [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] |
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN] | Rep. Mike Flood [R-NE] |
Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI] | Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] |
Rep. Aaron Bean [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 11. |
2024-09-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 10. |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1411 (Related) 2023-11-01 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7198/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7198/BILLS-118hr7198ih.pdf |