US HB7163 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To impose sanctions on government officials of Russia and Belarus who directly enabled Russia's invasion of Ukraine on February 24, 2022.
Title
Sanctioning Putin’s Enablers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7066 (Related) 2022-05-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7163/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7163/BILLS-117hr7163ih.pdf |