US HB7120 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to extend through 2023 the authority of the Federal Election Commission to impose civil money penalties on the basis of a schedule of penalties established and published by the Commission. This bill amends the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to extend through 2023 the administrative penalty authority of the Federal Election Commission.
Title
To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to extend through 2023 the authority of the Federal Election Commission to impose civil money penalties on the basis of a schedule of penalties established and published by the Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7527) |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-11-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-27 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9656) |
2018-11-27 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9656) |
2018-11-27 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2018-11-27 | House | Mr. Harper asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-11-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2018-11-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal Election Commission (FEC)
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal Election Commission (FEC)
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics