US HB70 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deficit Reduction, Job Creation, and Energy Security Act This bill requires the Department of the Interior to conduct oil and gas lease sales under the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act. The Deficit Reduction Acreage leased in those sales is in addition to the acreage proposed to be leased under the Proposed Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing Program for 2012-2017. This bill establishes the Deficit Reduction Energy Security Fund with sums from the Deficit Reduction Acreage lease sales for 15 years. The sums are to be transferred to the general fund and used solely to reduce the federal deficit. The interest earned on those sums will be transferred to the Coastal and Ocean Sustainability and Health Fund (COSH Fund), established under this Act. The National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration administers the COSH Fund for: (1) the Coastal and Ocean Disaster Grant Program for restoring, mitigating, monitoring, or otherwise managing coastal and ocean natural resources impacted by coastal or ocean disasters; and (2) the National Grant Program for Coastal and Ocean Sustainability and Health for restoring, protecting, maintaining, managing, or understanding marine resources and their habitats and resources in coastal and ocean water. This bill amends the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act to authorize Interior to reinstate expired producible leases in the offshore Gulf or Mexico upon the petition of a prior leaseholder if such reinstatement furthers the purposes and objectives of that Act. Interior must establish an Office of Energy Employment and Training to oversee the Interior's efforts to carry out this Act, and an Office of Minority and Women Inclusion. Further, Interior must take affirmative steps to seek diversity in all of its business and activities.
Title
Deficit Reduction, Job Creation, and Energy Security Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2015-01-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Alabama
Aquatic ecology
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Department of the Interior
Disaster relief and insurance
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy revenues and royalties
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Florida
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government trust funds
Gulf of Mexico
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Louisiana
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Minority employment
Mississippi
Oil and gas
Public contracts and procurement
Texas
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Women in business
Women's employment
Alabama
Aquatic ecology
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Department of the Interior
Disaster relief and insurance
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy revenues and royalties
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Florida
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government trust funds
Gulf of Mexico
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Louisiana
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Minority employment
Mississippi
Oil and gas
Public contracts and procurement
Texas
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Women in business
Women's employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/70/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr70/BILLS-114hr70ih.pdf |