US HB7 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 223-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 50. Record Vote Number: 227. (CR S3981)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 50. Record Vote Number: 227. (CR S3981)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to provide more effective remedies to victims of discrimination in the payment of wages on the basis of sex, and for other purposes.
Title
Paycheck Fairness Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure RC# 227 (Y: 49 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - House - On passage (Y: 217 N: 210 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A002) H.Amdt.37 (Y: 216 N: 207 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - On agreeing to the Miller-Meeks amendment (A003) H.Amdt.38 (Y: 183 N: 244 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - House - On passage (Y: 217 N: 210 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A002) H.Amdt.37 (Y: 216 N: 207 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - On agreeing to the Miller-Meeks amendment (A003) H.Amdt.38 (Y: 183 N: 244 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 50. Record Vote Number: 227. (CR S3981) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S3928) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S3928) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 46. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2021-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-04-15 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 217 - 210 (Roll no. 108). |
2021-04-15 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-04-15 | House | H.Amdt.38 On agreeing to the Miller-Meeks amendment (A003) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 183 - 244 (Roll no. 107). |
2021-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table. Agreed to without objection. |
2021-04-15 | House | H.Amdt.37 On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 207 (Roll no. 106). |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1826-1829) |
2021-04-15 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule XIX, further consideration of H.R. 7 was postponed until a time to be announced. |
2021-04-15 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Miller-Meeks amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Foxx demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2021-04-15 | House | H.Amdt.38 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule. |
2021-04-15 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 303, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Miller-Meeks amendment No. 4. |
2021-04-15 | House | H.Amdt.38 Amendment (A003) offered by Mrs. Miller-Meeks. (consideration: CR H1822-1825, H1827-1828; text: CR H1822-1823) |
2021-04-15 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Scott (VA) amendment en bloc No. 1, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Foxx demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2021-04-15 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 303, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Scott (VA) amendment en bloc No. 1. |
2021-04-15 | House | H.Amdt.37 Amendments en bloc (A002) offered by Mr. Scott (VA). (consideration: CR H1819-1822, H1826-1827; text: CR H1819-1820) |
2021-04-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 7. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7 and H.R. 1195. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 7 and provides one motion to recommit. Rule also provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 1195 and provides one motion to recommit. |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 303. (consideration: CR H1799-1825) |
2021-04-13 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 303 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7 and H.R. 1195. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 7 and provides one motion to recommit. Rule also provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 1195 and provides one motion to recommit. |
2021-04-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 2. |
2021-04-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 117-13. |
2021-03-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 22. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB205 (Same As) 2021-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR303 (Related) 2021-04-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2242 (Related) 2021-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB2490 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4934 (Related) 2021-08-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2591 (Related) 2021-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR303 (Related) 2021-04-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2242 (Related) 2021-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB2490 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4934 (Related) 2021-08-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2591 (Related) 2021-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.