US HB6984 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-05 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 98.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-05 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 98.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the Federal building located at 300 E. 3rd Street in North Platte, Nebraska, as the "Virginia Smith Federal Building", and for other purposes.
Title
To designate the Federal building located at 300 E. 3rd Street in North Platte, Nebraska, as the "Virginia Smith Federal Building", and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Mike Flood [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-05 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 98. |
2024-12-05 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 118-815. |
2024-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-09-18 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2024-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3577 (Same As) 2024-03-01 - Held at the desk.