US HB6966 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AQUAA Act Advancing the Quality and Understanding of American Aquaculture Act
Title
AQUAA Act Advancing the Quality and Understanding of American Aquaculture Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2018-10-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2018-09-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3138 (Same As) 2018-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Aquaculture
Arctic Ocean
Atlantic Ocean
Department of Commerce
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Fishes
Hunting and fishing
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Pacific Ocean
Public lands and natural resources
Seafood
Seashores and lakeshores
User charges and fees
Aquaculture
Arctic Ocean
Atlantic Ocean
Department of Commerce
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Fishes
Hunting and fishing
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Pacific Ocean
Public lands and natural resources
Seafood
Seashores and lakeshores
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6966/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6966/BILLS-115hr6966ih.pdf |