US HB6843 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To expand the boundaries of the Atchafalaya National Heritage Area to include Lafourche Parish, Louisiana.
Title
To expand the boundaries of the Atchafalaya National Heritage Area to include Lafourche Parish, Louisiana.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Julia Letlow [R-LA] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-12-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3542 (Related) 2024-05-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6843/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6843/BILLS-118hr6843ih.pdf |