US HB6799 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 436.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 436.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a special resource study to determine the suitability and feasibility of establishing the John P. Parker House in Ripley, Ohio, as a unit of the National Park System.
Title
John P. Parker House Study Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 436. |
2022-12-07 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-603. |
2022-07-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-07-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-20 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2022-07-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3685 (Related) 2022-10-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 541.