US HB6798 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide internet at residences owned or leased by the United States Government in foreign countries for the use of Department of State personnel, and for other purposes.
Title
Internet at Hardship Posts Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-12-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2043 (Related) 2023-08-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 189.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
SB2043 (Related) 2023-08-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 189.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6798/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6798/BILLS-118hr6798ih.pdf |