US HB6765 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cancels and waives certain debts owed to the United States. The bill cancels repayment for all uncollected amounts owed with respect to community disaster loans made by the federal government between January 1, 2006, and January 1, 2020, with respect to any major disaster declared under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act. The Federal Emergency Management Administration (FEMA), the Department of Housing and Urban Development, and the Small Business Administration shall waive a debt owed to the United States related to such assistance provided to an individual or household if (1) such debt owed is a result of an unauthorized use of funds for such assistance, and (2) the use of funds related to the same recovery for which the assistance was provided. Such debt may not be waived if it involves fraud by the debtor.
Title
Security After Sandy Act
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Debt collection
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Government lending and loan guarantees
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Government lending and loan guarantees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6765/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6765/BILLS-116hr6765ih.pdf |