US HB6737 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the National Housing Act to repeal waiting period requirements for guarantees provided by the Government National Mortgage Association (Ginnie Mae). Specifically, Ginnie Mae may guarantee a security backed by a refinanced Department of Veterans Affairs housing loan without a waiting period.
Title
Protect Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2018-09-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9064) |
2018-09-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6737. |
2018-09-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9064-9065) |
2018-09-26 | House | Mr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 768. |
2018-09-26 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-983. |
2018-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 49 - 0. |
2018-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-09-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3536 (Related) 2018-10-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3726 (Related) 2018-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3726 (Related) 2018-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.