US HB6528 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require owners of covered federally assisted rental dwelling units to install temperature sensors in such units, and for other purposes.
Title
Housing Temperature Safety Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2022-07-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-07-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7149) |
2022-07-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6528. |
2022-07-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7149-7150) |
2022-07-26 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-07-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 328. |
2022-07-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 117-422. |
2022-06-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-06-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2022-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3561 (Related) 2022-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.