US HB6498 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-29 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-29 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize music-related exchange programs facilitated by the Department of State and relevant private sector partnerships, and for other purposes.
Title
PEACE through Music Diplomacy Act Promoting Peace, Education, And Cultural Exchange through Music Diplomacy Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 3. |
2022-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4195 (Related) 2022-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/6498/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr6498/BILLS-117hr6498ih.pdf |