US HB6474 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-17 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-17 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to expedite geothermal exploration and development in previously studied or developed areas.
Title
To amend the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to expedite geothermal exploration and development in previously studied or developed areas.
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Steel [R-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2024-01-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged |
2023-12-12 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2023-11-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-11-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6474/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6474/BILLS-118hr6474ih.pdf |