US HB6474 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the expansion of the Rural Health Care Program of the Federal Communications Commission in response to COVID-19, and for other purposes.
Title
Healthcare Broadband Expansion During COVID-19 Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3838 (Related) 2020-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3838 (Related) 2020-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government trust funds
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Telephone and wireless communication
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government trust funds
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6474/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6474/BILLS-116hr6474ih.pdf |