US HB6336 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve Federal activities relating to wildfires, and for other purposes.
Title
Western Wildfire Support Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-12-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-12-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-12-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics. |
2021-12-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-12-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2404 (Same As) 2021-12-15 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/6336/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr6336/BILLS-117hr6336ih.pdf |