US SB2404 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes activities to address wildfires. The bill requires the Department of Agriculture (USDA) and the Department of the Interior to establish spatial fire management plans before the end of FY2024. The bill establishes accounts in the Treasury for addressing wildfires, a program to train and certify citizens who wish to be able to volunteer to assist USDA or Interior during a wildland fire incident, a program to award grants to eligible states or units of local government to acquire slip-on tank and pump units for a surge capacity of resources for fire suppression, the Theodore Roosevelt Genius Prize for the management of wildfire-related invasive species, and the Management of Wildfire-Related Invasive Species Technology Advisory Board. The bill also requires the Department of Defense (DOD) to reimburse a state or federal agency for the costs of wildfire suppression as a result of a fire caused by DOD activity, requires the Joint Fire Science Program to work with unmanned aircraft test ranges to carry out research and development of unmanned aircraft system fire applications, requires federal and state disaster preparedness programs to include postdisaster assistance, and authorizes the Federal Emergency Management Agency to provide funding to a state agency to establish and operate a website to provide information relating to postfire recovery funding and resources to a community or an individual impacted by a wildland fire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Western Wildfire Support Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-15SenateCommittee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
2021-10-21SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
2021-07-20SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB6336 (Same As) 2022-01-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.

Subjects

Accounting and auditing
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Appropriations
Atmospheric science and weather
Aviation and airports
Budget process
Community life and organization
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Disaster relief and insurance
Ecology
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Land use and conservation
Military education and training
Military operations and strategy
Motor vehicles
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Research and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Transportation safety and security
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback