US HB6309 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 659.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 659.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing Working Seniors to Keep Their Health Savings Accounts Act of 2018 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow individuals who are entitled to receive hospital insurance benefits under Medicare Part A because they are age 65 or older to contribute to health savings accounts.
Title
Allowing Working Seniors to Keep Their Health Savings Accounts Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 659. |
2018-07-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-851. |
2018-07-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 16. |
2018-07-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-07-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6283 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6311 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Received in the Senate.
HB6311 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Received in the Senate.