US HB6302 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-311.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-311.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Overtime Pay for Secret Service Agents Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill authorizes U.S. Secret Service special agents performing protective services to be paid an amount of premium pay during 2016 to the extent that the total of basic pay and such premium pay for any pay period does not exceed the annual rate of basic pay for level II of the Executive Schedule. Such additional pay shall not be considered to be basic pay for retirement or any other purpose and shall not be used in computing a lump-sum payment for accumulated and accrued annual leave upon separation from the service.
Title
Overtime Pay for Secret Service Agents Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-311. |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-13 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H7586; text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H7586) |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Mr. Smith (NJ) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendments. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.5179 Amendment SA 5179 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.5179 Amendment SA 5179 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S7131-7132; text: CR S7131-7132) |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (text as passed Senate: CR S7131) |
2016-12-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.5178 Amendment SA 5178 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.5178 Amendment SA 5178 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S7131; text: CR S7131) |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7131-7132) |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2016-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H7006-7007) |
2016-11-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6302. |
2016-11-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7006-7008) |
2016-11-30 | House | Mr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-11-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 658. |
2016-11-29 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-837. |
2016-11-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-11-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-11-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-11-14 | House | Introduced in House |