US HB6277 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Main Street Tax Certainty Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the deduction for qualified business income. (Under current law, the deduction expires after December 31, 2025.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Main Street Tax Certainty Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2018-06-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2687 (Related) 2018-04-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6760 (Related) 2018-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1084 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback