US SB2687 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Tax Cuts and Jobs Act Official Titles Official Titles - Senate Official Titles as Introduced A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent the individual tax provisions of the tax reform law, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Cuts and Jobs Act Official Titles Official Titles - Senate Official Titles as Introduced A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent the individual tax provisions of the tax reform law, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

SB2281 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2291 (Related) 2018-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6277 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6760 (Related) 2018-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1084 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback