US HB6255 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1089, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1089, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 18, United States Code, to establish measures to combat invasive lionfish, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend title 18, United States Code, to establish measures to combat invasive lionfish, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1089, Part I. |
2018-09-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-26 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2018-08-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-07-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2018-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6255/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6255/BILLS-115hr6255ih.pdf |