US HB624 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) to study and report on possible revisions to regulations regarding Rule 10b5-1 trading plans. (Such plans allow certain employees of publicly traded corporations to sell their shares without violating insider trading prohibitions.) The SEC must revise regulations consistent with the results of the study.
Title
Promoting Transparent Standards for Corporate Insiders Act
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 52 (Y: 413 N: 3 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-01-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 3 (Roll no. 52). (text: CR H1221) |
2019-01-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1232) |
2019-01-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-01-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 624. |
2019-01-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1221-1223) |
2019-01-28 | House | Mr. Himes moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB573 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Employee benefits and pensions
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government studies and investigations
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Congressional oversight
Employee benefits and pensions
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government studies and investigations
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)