US HB6201 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the authority for the establishment of a commemorative work to honor enslaved and free Black persons who served in the American Revolution, and for other purposes.
Title
National Liberty Memorial Preservation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] |
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] | Rep. Shontel Brown [D-OH] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] |
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 513. |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 117-171. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2022-04-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4484) |
2022-04-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6201. |
2022-04-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4484-4485) |
2022-04-26 | House | Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-04-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 221. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-299. |
2022-02-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-02-16 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-12-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-12-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-12-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3334 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.