US HB6169 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior, the Forest Service, and the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers to jointly develop and adopt interagency standards to ensure compatibility and interoperability among federal databases for the collection and dissemination of outdoor recreation data related to federal lands. Interior, the Forest Service, and the Corps of Engineers must digitize and publish geographic information system mapping data that includes federal interests, including easements and rights-of-way, in private land; status information as to whether roads and trails are open or closed; the dates on which roads and trails are seasonally opened and closed; the types of vehicles that are allowed on each segment of roads and trails; the boundaries of areas where hunting or recreational shooting is regulated or closed; and the boundaries of any portion of a body of water that is closed to entry, is closed to watercraft, or has horsepower limitations for watercraft.
Title
Modernizing Access to Our Public Land Act
Sponsors
Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2020-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3427 (Same As) 2020-09-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Digital media
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Marine and inland water transportation
Motor vehicles
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pedestrians and bicycling
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
Digital media
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Marine and inland water transportation
Motor vehicles
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pedestrians and bicycling
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6169/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6169/BILLS-116hr6169ih.pdf |