US HB6068 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Counter Terrorism and Illicit Finance Act
Title
Counter Terrorism and Illicit Finance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-06-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-11-29 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Terrorism and Illicit Finance Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6849 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6850 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6851 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6853 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6858 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6861 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6865 (Related) 2018-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6892 (Related) 2018-09-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6850 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6851 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6853 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6858 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6861 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6865 (Related) 2018-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6892 (Related) 2018-09-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Currency
Department of the Treasury
Finance and financial sector
Foreign and international banking
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Small business
Terrorism
User charges and fees
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Currency
Department of the Treasury
Finance and financial sector
Foreign and international banking
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Small business
Terrorism
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6068/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6068/BILLS-115hr6068ih.pdf |