US HB5996 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Carter (GA) asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 5996, a bill originally introduced by Representative Fortenberry, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Carter (GA) asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 5996, a bill originally introduced by Representative Fortenberry, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To continue the whole-of-government approach to ending global wildlife poaching and trafficking by permanently reauthorizing the activities of the Presidential Task Force on Wildlife Trafficking, and for other purposes.
Title
Eliminate, Neutralize, and Disrupt Wildlife Trafficking Reauthorization and Improvements Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | House | ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Carter (GA) asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 5996, a bill originally introduced by Representative Fortenberry, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-11-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3211 (Same As) 2022-06-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 404.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5996/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5996/BILLS-117hr5996ih.pdf |