US SB3211 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 404.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 404.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to continue the whole-of-government approach to ending global wildlife poaching and trafficking by permanently reauthorizing the activities of the Presidential Task Force on Wildlife Trafficking, and for other purposes.
Title
Eliminate, Neutralize, and Disrupt Wildlife Trafficking Reauthorization and Improvements Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 404. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5996 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Carter (GA) asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 5996, a bill originally introduced by Representative Fortenberry, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.