US HB5891 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 180.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 180.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve and enhance retirement savings, and for other purposes.
Title
RISE Act Retirement Improvement and Savings Enhancement Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 180. |
2022-02-25 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 117-250, Part I. |
2021-11-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-11-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-11-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5873 (Related) 2021-11-04 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB5877 (Related) 2021-11-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB3746 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3751 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5877 (Related) 2021-11-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB3746 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3751 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.