US HB5882 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows state Medicaid programs to pay for certain gene therapy drugs through risk-sharing value-based payment agreements with drug manufacturers. The bill applies to covered outpatient drugs that provide potentially curative treatment for serious or life-threatening rare diseases or conditions after not more than three administrations.
Title
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to provide States with the option under the Medicaid program to pay for covered outpatient drugs through risk-sharing value-based agreements, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB2543 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 225.
SB4199 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4228)
SB2543 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 225.
SB4199 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4228)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Genetics
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Home and outpatient care
Intergovernmental relations
Manufacturing
Medicaid
Prescription drugs
State and local government operations
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Genetics
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Home and outpatient care
Intergovernmental relations
Manufacturing
Medicaid
Prescription drugs
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5882/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5882/BILLS-116hr5882ih.pdf |