US HB58 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a separate account in the Treasury to hold deposits to be used to secure the southern border of the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
Fund and Complete the Border Wall Act
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Marjorie Greene [R-GA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
Rep. Robert Good [R-VA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-01-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, Education and Labor, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6022 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/58/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr58/BILLS-117hr58ih.pdf |