US HB6022 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to increase the civil penalty for unlawfully entering the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
Build Better Borders Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2021-11-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB58 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/6022/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr6022/BILLS-117hr6022ih.pdf |