US HB5769 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Howard Coble Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Act of 2014
Title
Howard Coble Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV] | Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 413 N: 3 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2014-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 3 (Roll no. 541). (text: CR H8289-8301) |
2014-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-03 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8310-8311) |
2014-12-03 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5769. |
2014-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8289-8305) |
2014-12-03 | House | Mr. Hunter moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2014-12-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2444 (Related) 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-281.
Subjects
Accidents
Actions and defenses
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Arctic and polar regions
Aviation and airports
Border security and unlawful immigration
Canada
Caribbean area
Child care and development
Coast guard
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Denmark
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
District of Columbia
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency communications systems
Emergency planning and evacuation
Europe
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Maritime Commission
Federal-Indian relations
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Great Lakes
Higher education
Historical and cultural resources
Homeland security
Iceland
International organizations and cooperation
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Legal fees and court costs
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Navigation, waterways, harbors
New York State
Norway
Oil and gas
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Roads and highways
Russia
Student aid and college costs
Transportation and public works
Transportation costs
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Washington State
Actions and defenses
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Arctic and polar regions
Aviation and airports
Border security and unlawful immigration
Canada
Caribbean area
Child care and development
Coast guard
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Denmark
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
District of Columbia
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency communications systems
Emergency planning and evacuation
Europe
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Maritime Commission
Federal-Indian relations
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Great Lakes
Higher education
Historical and cultural resources
Homeland security
Iceland
International organizations and cooperation
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Legal fees and court costs
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Navigation, waterways, harbors
New York State
Norway
Oil and gas
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Roads and highways
Russia
Student aid and college costs
Transportation and public works
Transportation costs
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Washington State