US HB5723 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 203-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To protect our Social Security system and improve benefits for current and future generations.
Title
Social Security 2100: A Sacred Trust
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3071 (Related) 2021-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4143 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
SB2204 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4777-4778)
HB8005 (Related) 2022-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SB4365 (Related) 2022-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8717 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4143 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
SB2204 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4777-4778)
HB8005 (Related) 2022-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SB4365 (Related) 2022-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8717 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5723/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5723/BILLS-117hr5723ih.pdf |