US HB8005 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To enhance Social Security benefits and ensure the long-term solvency of the Social Security program.
Title
Social Security Expansion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] |
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] |
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2022-06-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2022-06-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-06-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5215 (Related) 2021-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
HB5723 (Related) 2021-10-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB307 (Related) 2021-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB4365 (Same As) 2022-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5723 (Related) 2021-10-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB307 (Related) 2021-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB4365 (Same As) 2022-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8005/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8005/BILLS-117hr8005ih.pdf |