US HB5715 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize the Morris K. Udall and Stewart L. Udall Trust Fund, and for other purposes.
Title
To reauthorize the Morris K. Udall and Stewart L. Udall Trust Fund, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9680) |
2022-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5715. |
2022-12-12 | House | Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9680-9681) |
2022-12-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-596, Part I. |
2022-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-03-31 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States held a hearing. |
2021-10-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-25 | House | Introduced in House |