US HB5681 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3989)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Global Engagement Center Authorities Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Global Engagement Center Authorities Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3989)
2018-05-09HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
2018-05-09HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2018-05-09HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-05-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
2018-05-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-05-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-05-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB5515 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback