US HB5655 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to require providers of a covered service to provide location information concerning the telecommunications device of a user of such service to an investigative or law enforcement officer or an employee or other agent of a public safety answering point in an emergency situation involving risk of death or serious physical harm or in order to respond to the user's call for emergency services.
Title
Kelsey Smith Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] |
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB466 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5655/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5655/BILLS-117hr5655ih.pdf |