US HB5647 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 113-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pregnant Workers Fairness Act - Declares it an unlawful employment practice for employers, employment agencies, labor organizations, and other specified entities to: (1) not make reasonable accommodations to known limitations related to the pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions of job applicants or employees, unless the accommodation would impose an undue hardship on such an entity's business operation; (2) deny employment opportunities based on the need of the entity to make such reasonable accommodations; (3) require such job applicants or employees to accept an accommodation that they choose not to accept; or (4) require such employees to take leave if another reasonable accommodation can be provided to their known limitations. Sets forth enforcement procedures and remedies under the Civil Rights Act of 1964, Congressional Accountability Act of 1995, Government Employee Rights Act of 1991, and the rights and protections extended to presidential offices. Directs the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC) to issue regulations to carry out this Act, including the identification of reasonable accommodations addressing known limitations related to pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions.
Title
Pregnant Workers Fairness Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2012-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution. |
2012-05-08 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2012-05-08 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2012-05-08 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2012-05-08 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2012-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Oversight and Government Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3565 (Same As) 2012-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child care and development
Civil actions and liability
Employee hiring
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Labor and employment
Sex and reproductive health
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's employment
Child care and development
Civil actions and liability
Employee hiring
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Labor and employment
Sex and reproductive health
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/5647/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr5647/BILLS-112hr5647ih.pdf |