US HB5633 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-16 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-16 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Blackfeet Water Rights Settlement Act
Title
Blackfeet Water Rights Settlement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Motion (Motion to Concur in the House Amendment to S. 612) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Passage of the Bill S. 2848 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Passage of the Bill S. 2848 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-11-16 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2016-11-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2016-07-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2016-07-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Forests, forestry, trees
Government liability
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Lakes and rivers
Montana
Native Americans
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Water storage
Water use and supply
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Forests, forestry, trees
Government liability
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Lakes and rivers
Montana
Native Americans
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Water storage
Water use and supply